IL SB2745 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. In provisions concerning procedures for a large public utility to acquire a water or sewer utility, provides that if the water or sewer utility being acquired is owned by the State or a political subdivision of the State, a referendum will be required to approve the acquisition of the water or sewer utility by the large public utility (rather than only requiring a public meeting and publication of the terms of acquisition in a newspaper of general circulation in the area that the water or sewer utility operates). Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITY-WATER/SEWER REFERENDUM
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] |
Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 9-210.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2745&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2745.htm |