IL SB2744 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
PROP TX-ASSESSORS/ASSESSMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-08 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - January 2, 2019 |
2019-01-02 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-11-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-000 |
2018-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-11-20 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 375 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |