IL SB2743 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. In provisions concerning persons authorized to have access to reports of child abuse or neglect, provides that State's Attorneys are authorized to receive unfounded reports for the purposes of screening and prosecuting court petitions making an allegation of abuse or neglect relating to the same child, a sibling of the child involving the same perpetrator, or a child or perpetrator in the same household as the child for whom the petition is being filed. Provides that parties to juvenile court proceedings are entitled to receive copies of unfounded reports regarding the same child, a sibling of the child, or a child or perpetrator in the same household as the child, including a household from which a child was removed or into which a child may be placed for purposes of certain types of juvenile court hearings. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to notify parties of the final finding on a report of alleged abuse or neglect within 5 days after the Department classifies the report. Provides that a court shall not terminate wardship if there is a pending investigation involving any person acting in a caretaker role in the minor's household, unless the court makes written factual findings that, despite the pending investigation, there is no risk of abuse or neglect to the minor, that good cause exists to terminate wardship, and it is in the minor's best interest to terminate wardship. Effective upon becoming law, except some provisions take effect January 1, 2021.
Title
DCFS-JUV CT-ABUSE RPT&PETITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 7.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 7.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-8.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2743&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2743.htm |