IL SB2735 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that any group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2026 shall offer all reasonably available methods of payment from the insurer or managed care plan, or its contracted vendor, to the contracted health care provider. Provides that an insurer or managed care plan shall not mandate payment by credit card. Provides that if one of the available payment methods has a fee associated with it, the insurer or managed care plan, or its contracted vendor, shall notify the health care provider of certain information and provide the health care provider with instructions on how to select each method. Provides that if a health care provider requests a change in the available payment method, the insurer or managed care plan, or its contracted vendor, shall implement the change to the payment method selected by the health care provider within 30 business days, subject to federal and State verification measures to prevent fraud and abuse. Provides that an insurer or managed care plan shall not use a health care provider's preferred method of payment as a factor when deciding whether to provide credentials to a health care provider. Defines terms. Amends the Health Maintenance Organization Act to make a conforming change.
Title
INS-ELECTRONIC PAYMENT FEES
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
Rep. William Hauter [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0618 |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 125 | 4-6.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 355.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |