IL SB2734 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Advisory Board for the Maternal and Child Health Block Grant Programs Act. Establishes the Advisory Board for the Maternal and Child Health Block Grant Programs under the Department of Public Health. Creates the Board. Requires the Board to advise the Director of Public Health and make recommendations to the Department and Governor regarding maternal and child health matters. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Transfers authority over the Title V Maternal and Child Health Services Block Grant, Title X Family Planning Program award, and maternal and child health programs to the Department of Public Health. Transfers all relevant rights and duties, rules and rulemaking powers, personnel, property, records, and revenue allocations to the Department of Public Health. Amends the Illinois Family Case Management Act. Removes references to the Maternal and Child Health Advisory Board. Amends the Hearing Screening for Newborns Act. Changes the short title to the Early Hearing Detection and Intervention Act. Makes changes regarding which hospitals are required to conduct and report infant hearing tests. Requires the Department of Public Health to maintain a registry of cases documenting newborn hearing tests and intervention. Transfers rulemaking power under the Act from the Department of Human Services to the Department of Public Health. Repeals provisions concerning certain hospital reports to the Department and the hearing screening advisory committee. Amends the Prenatal and Newborn Care Act. Repeals a provision requiring the Department of Human Services to consult with the Advisory Board. Amends the Developmental Disability Prevention Act. Authorizes the Department of Public Health to determine funding needs for high-risk pregnancy programs. Effective immediately.
Title
MATERNAL AND CHILD HEALTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0901 |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2016 |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2016-05-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-05-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 5, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2310 | 2310-450 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 212 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
410 | 212 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
410 | 213 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 213 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
410 | 213 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 213 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
410 | 213 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 213 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 225 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
410 | 250 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |