IL SB2721 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Attorney General Act. Makes a technical change in the Section concerning the short title of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRANSMITTERS-MONEY-FINGERPRINT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-13SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152050.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback