IL SB2711 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Permits the State Board of Education to make payments for grants provided by the United States Department of Agriculture, the United States Department of Education, or any other federal agency for any fiscal year without regard to the fact that the services being compensated for by such payment may have been rendered in a prior fiscal year. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
FINANCE-STATE BD OF EDU-GRANTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1147 |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Effective Date December 31, 2014 |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William Delgado |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - December 2, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-11-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2014-11-20 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 010-000-001 |
2014-11-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-11-19 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2014-11-19 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-11-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-11-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-11-18 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-10-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William Delgado |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Education; |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |