IL SB2696 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0933
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0933
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Department of Central Management Services.
Title
DNR-CONVEY REAL ESTATE-LAKE CO
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] |
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0933 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |