IL SB2696 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Department of Central Management Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNR-CONVEY REAL ESTATE-LAKE CO

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20405405-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback