IL SB2693 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0932
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0932
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vocational Academies Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
PROFESSIONAL EDUCATOR LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0932 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-008-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 006-002-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 433 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |