IL SB2677 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Labor Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOID CARD-ELECTRONIC VERSION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Anderson
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-19SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2015051505-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback