IL SB2677 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Labor Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
FOID CARD-ELECTRONIC VERSION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Anderson |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1505 | 1505-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |