IL SB2675 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT-HUBZONE CONTRACTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
2018-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-011-000
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fowler
2018-05-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 007-000-000
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-01SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2017051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback