IL SB2674 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Film Production Services Tax Credit Act of 2008. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
PROP TX-SINGLE BIDDER RULE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 16 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |