IL SB2667 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0838
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENTERPRISE ZONE ELIGIBILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0838
2018-08-13SenateEffective Date August 13, 2018
2018-08-13SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-005-000
2018-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-12SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2667&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2667.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2667eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2667enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0838.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2667sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2667ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2667ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2667_04252018_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2667_05302018_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2667ham002_05312018_045001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2667ham001_05312018_045000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback