IL SB2663 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Water District Act. Provides that specified areas in Champaign County are annexed into the territory of the Sangamon Valley Public Water District on the effective date of the amendatory Act. Contains legislative findings. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC WATER DIST-CHAMPAIGN

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-20HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Public Utilities Committee; 022-000-000
2021-05-13HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
2021-05-13HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2021-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2021-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-07HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-05-07HouseArrived in House
2021-05-06SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2021-05-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Rose
2021-05-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Bennett
2021-05-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Bennett
2021-05-06SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-05-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 015-000-000
2021-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2021-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
2021-04-29SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 016-000-000
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 016-000-000
2021-04-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
2021-03-25SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5701Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback