IL SB2663 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Combines youth hunting and trapping licensing. Provides that the fee for a Youth Hunting and Trapping License is $7. Provides before any youth 18 shall take or attempt to take any species protected by the Code for which an open season is established, the youth shall first procure and possess a valid Youth Hunting and Trapping License. Provides that a Youth Hunting and Trapping License shall entitle the licensee to hunt or trap while supervised by an adult (rather than a parent, grandparent, or guardian) who is 21 years of age or older and has a valid Illinois hunting or trapping license. Provides that youth licensed shall not hunt or trap or carry a hunting or trapping device, including, but not limited to, a firearm, bow and arrow, or crossbow unless the youth is accompanied by and under the close personal supervision of an adult (rather than a parent, grandparent, or guardian) who is 21 years of age or older and has a valid Illinois hunting or trapping license. Provides that if a youth has a valid certificate of competency for hunting or trapping approved by the Department of Natural Resources, he or she is exempt from supervision requirements. Eliminates provision providing that before a trapping license shall be issued to any person under the age of sixteen years, the person shall obtain the written consent of his father, mother, or legally constituted guardian to obtain the license. Defines "youth". Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-YOUTH HUNT & TRAP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 007-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52051.2v-1New CodeSee Bill Text
52053.1Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.1-5Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.1-9Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.2Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback