IL SB2662 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the legislative purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN SERVICES CONTRACTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-001-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-04SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013051-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback