IL SB2662 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the legislative purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN SERVICES CONTRACTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 40 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-040-001
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Rules Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-001-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-04SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013051-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2662&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2662.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2662eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2662enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2662sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2662sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2662ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2662_04252018_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2662_05282018_039000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2662ham001_05302018_048000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback