IL SB2661 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Deposit of State Moneys Act. Modifies a Section concerning agreements entered into by the State Treasurer with any bank or savings and loan association relating to the deposit of securities. Provides that such agreements may authorize the holding of securities in any bank or a depository trust company in the United States (rather than New York City). Adds to the classes of securities that the State Treasurer may accept as collateral for deposits not insured by an agency of the federal government. Adds to and modifies the investments in which the State Treasurer may in invest or reinvest on behalf of the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREASURER-DEPOSIT STATE MONEY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 008-000-000
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1552010Amended CodeCitation Text
1552011Amended CodeCitation Text
1552022.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback