IL SB2658 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0821
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that a Professional Educator License with Stipulations with a provisional educator endorsement obtained by a service member or a spouse of a service member is valid until June 30 immediately following 3 (rather than 2) years of the license being issued. Defines "spouse of a service member". Effective September 3, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-EDU LICENSE-SERVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0821
2018-08-13SenateEffective Date September 3, 2018
2018-08-13SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-001-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Education; 008-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback