IL SB2655 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0978
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0978
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that in selecting a permanency goal for a minor over age 15 of substitute care pending independence, the Department of Children and Family Services may provide services to enable reunification and to strengthen the minor's connections with family, fictive kin, and other responsible adults, provided the services are in the minor's best interest. Provides that those services shall be documented in the service plan. Makes conforming changes in the Children and Family Services Act.
Title
JUV CT-PERMANENCY GOALS
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0978 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date August 19, 2018 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-05-31 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-31 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-31 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |