IL SB2655 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0978
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that in selecting a permanency goal for a minor over age 15 of substitute care pending independence, the Department of Children and Family Services may provide services to enable reunification and to strengthen the minor's connections with family, fictive kin, and other responsible adults, provided the services are in the minor's best interest. Provides that those services shall be documented in the service plan. Makes conforming changes in the Children and Family Services Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-PERMANENCY GOALS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-19SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0978
2018-08-19SenateEffective Date August 19, 2018
2018-08-19SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2018
2018-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-31HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-31HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-31HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-31HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-28Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback