IL SB2654 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-003-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires the school board of a school district to include information about influenza and influenza vaccinations in accordance with the latest recommendations of the Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention when it provides information on immunizations, infectious diseases, medications, or other school health issues to the parents or guardians of students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-INFLUENZA VACCINE INFO

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-003-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105527-8.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback