IL SB2651 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that a judicial district committee for each judicial district and a judicial circuit committee for each judicial circuit, among other committees, are authorized and shall constitute the central or managing committees of each political party for the purpose of making nominations in certain instances under the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTIONS-PARTY MANAGING CMTE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 015-000-001
2018-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Link
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1057-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback