IL SB2650 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires the System to implement a defined contribution plan for employees of the Illinois State Board of Elections who are not covered by a collective bargaining agreement. Provides that the defined contribution plan shall aggregate State and employee contributions in individual participant accounts which are used for payouts after retirement. Authorizes an eligible employee of the Illinois State Board of Elections to elect to participate in the defined contribution plan instead of the defined benefit plan and to also elect to terminate all participation in the defined benefit plan and to have a specified amount credited to his or her account. Provides that State contributions shall be paid into the accounts of participants in the defined contribution plan at a rate of 3% of compensation and that State contributions, and the earnings thereon, shall vest when those contributions are paid into the participant's account. Provides that employee contributions shall be paid at a rate of 3% of compensation. Contains provisions concerning investment options; defined disability benefits; notice to eligible employees; plan sponsor; reporting; and the intent of the amendatory Act. Excludes the defined contribution plan from the definition of "new benefit increase". Makes related changes in the Retirement Systems Reciprocal Act (Article 20 of the Code) and the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-BD OF ELECTIONS-DC PLAN
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-155.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 20-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2650&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2650.htm |