IL SB2647 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "manual traffic law enforcement system". Provides that the provisions of the Code shall not be deemed to prevent local authorities with respect to streets and highways under their jurisdiction and within the reasonable exercise of the police power from allowing and regulating the use of a manual traffic law enforcement system. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MANUAL TRAFFIC LAW SYSTEM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-004-000
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-17SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-004-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Judiciary
2018-03-13SenateRe-referred to Judiciary
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62551-141.5New CodeSee Bill Text
625511-208Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback