IL SB2645 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act, the Motor Fuel Tax Law, the Emergency Telephone System Act, the Riverboat Gambling Act, and the Video Gaming Act. Provides that, in the absence of an appropriation for any State fiscal year, moneys that are required to be distributed to units of local government and other entities from the State and Local Sales Tax Reform Fund, the Motor Fuel Tax Fund, the State Gaming Fund, the Local Government Video Gaming Distributive Fund, and the Statewide 9-1-1 Fund are subject to a continuing appropriation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE/OCC-MOTOR FUEL-LOCAL GOV

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2301012Amended CodeCitation Text
2301013Amended CodeCitation Text
2304075Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-17Amended CodeCitation Text
355058Amended CodeCitation Text
5075030Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback