IL SB2644 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0880
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0880
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that notice to parties in a contested case under the Act shall be served, among other forms of service, by email. Provides that parties in a contested case under the Act shall be notified, among other forms of notification, by email of any decision or order in that case. Provides for specified requirements for the consent of service by email. Provides that an agency may request, but not require, unless otherwise required by law, an unrepresented party to designate an email address to which specified documents may be transmitted. Provides that no document described in specified provisions may be served by email to the extent the documents contains certain specified information. Provides that service by email is deemed complete on the day of transmission. Provides that agencies that use email to service documents shall adopt rules that specify the standard for confirming delivery, and in failure to confirm delivery, what steps the agency will take to ensure that service by email or other means is accomplished.
Title
ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE-EMAIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0880 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2018-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 020-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 10-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 10-75 | New Code | See Bill Text |