IL SB2643 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency may not enter into new contracts or renew any contract previously made with one or more responsible parties to construct and operate official inspection stations, provide and maintain approved test equipment, administer tests, certify results, issue emission inspection stickers or certificates, maintain records, train personnel, provide information to the public concerning the program, or otherwise. Provides that any facility that performs maintenance or repair work on motor vehicles as a routine part of its business may apply to the Agency for certification as an official inspection station. Provides that the Agency shall authorize as an official inspection station any applicant that meets specific criteria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-INSPECTION STATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625513C-45Amended CodeCitation Text
625513C-45.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback