IL SB2642 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Act of 2004. Provides that an individual who is a former peace officer but continues to perform services in an armed capacity that is a licensed activity under the Act is required to obtain a permanent employee registration card but is not required to obtain a firearm control card if the individual is in compliance with the federal Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act of 2004. Provides that an agency that employs an officer who elects to carry a firearm pursuant to the federal Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act of 2004 shall submit a notice of such election along with a fee to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM CONTROL CARD-OFFICER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-001
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-000-001
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22544735-35Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback