IL SB2641 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Renter's Financial Responsibility and Protection Act. Provides that a rental car company may void a damage waiver if damage or loss occurs to the rental vehicle when the rental vehicle is stolen and the renter fails to: (i) return the rental vehicle's ignition key and key tag identifying the rental vehicle to the rental company; (ii) file a police report within the 24-hour period after discovery of the rental vehicle theft; and (iii) fully cooperate with the rental company, law enforcement agency, or any other authority in all matters connected to the investigation of the stolen rental vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RENTAL CAR-DAMAGE WAIVER-VOID

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-001
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Transportation; 018-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6252715Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback