IL SB2638 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Governmental Account Audit Act. Provides that an audit report based on the governmental unit's selection of the accrual, cash, or modified cash basis of accounting meets all requirements for conformity with generally accepted accounting principles, including the certification of the accountant or accountants making the audit that the audit has been performed in compliance with generally accepted auditing standards. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOV ACCOUNT AUDITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Government Transparency Committee
2018-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-16HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-16HouseArrived in House
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-003-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Clayborne
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Clayborne
2018-05-16SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-002-000
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-002-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 006-001-001
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-02-28SenatePostponed - Local Government
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
503105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback