IL SB2632 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning boundaries.
Title
DNR-CONVEY REAL ESTATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Althoff |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 1-1002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |