IL SB2632 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "mobile computing headset". Provides that a person may not operate a motor vehicle while wearing a mobile computing headset. Provides limited exceptions to this prohibition for (1) law enforcement officers or emergency vehicle operators in the performance of their official duties; (2) drivers using a mobile computing headset to communicate with emergency personnel; and (3) drivers that are parked on the shoulder of a roadway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DRIVING WITH COMPUTER HEADSETS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-13SenateSession Sine Die
2014-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2014-04-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2014-03-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014
2014-02-19SenatePostponed - Transportation
2014-02-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2014-02-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2014-02-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2014-01-29SenateAssigned to Transportation
2013-12-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-12-03SenateFirst Reading
2013-12-03SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625512-610.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback