IL SB2631 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Changes references to "restricted faculty license" to references to "faculty license". Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DENTAL-FACULTY LICENSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Jones
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2252511Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback