IL SB2628 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD WELFARE WORKFORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000
2018-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2018-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-002-000
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-18HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-18HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Morrison
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-04SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205051.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2628&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2628.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2628eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2628enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2628sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2628sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2628sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2628ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2628_04252018_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2628_05212018_018000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2628ham001_05302018_027000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback