IL SB2623 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Re-assigned to Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires every insurance company authorized to do business in this State or accredited by this State with assets of at least $100,000,000 to submit an annual report on its voluntary supplier diversity program to the Department of Insurance. Sets forth provisions on what the report must include and how and when the report must be submitted. Provides that, for each report, the Department shall publish the results on its Internet website for 5 years after submission. Requires the Department to hold an annual insurance company supplier diversity workshop in February of 2019 and every February thereafter to discuss the reports with representatives of the insurance companies and vendors. Provides that the Department shall prepare a template for voluntary supplier diversity reports. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CODE-SUPPLIER DIVERSITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateRe-assigned to Insurance
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155155.46New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback