IL SB2620 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Provides that the Capital Development Board shall maintain on its website links to all currently applicable State building codes. Requires State agencies that propose to adopt new building or construction requirements, or amendments to existing requirements, to report certain information to the Capital Development Board. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDB-STATE BUILDING CODES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee; 006-000-000
2018-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20310519New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback