IL SB2620 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Township Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning appropriations for public graveyards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2016
2016-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2016-04-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 015-000-000
2016-03-30SenateAssigned to Executive
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60130-60Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback