IL SB2619 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In provisions regarding appointment of a fire chief, acting chief, the department head, or a position, by whatever title, that is responsible for day-to-day operations of a fire department, limits home rule powers on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-APPOINTMENT OF FIRE CHIEF

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 57 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHome Rule Note Request is Inapplicable
2018-05-24HouseMotion Prevailed 057-046-001
2018-05-24HouseNote / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-24HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2018-05-24HouseMotion Prevailed 057-046-001
2018-05-24HouseNote / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-23HousePension Note Filed
2018-05-23HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-23HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-23HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-23HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-002-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Anderson
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-003-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-001-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-28SenatePostponed - Local Government
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65510-1-7.3Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-2.1-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback