IL SB2618 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Environmental Health Practitioner Licensing Act from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2029. Amends the Environmental Health Practitioner Licensing Act. Provides that applicants and licensees shall provide the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation with a valid address and email address and inform the Department of any changes within 14 days. Makes changes to the grounds by which the Department may refuse to issue, renew, revoke, suspend, or discipline a license because of the applicant's or licensee's criminal history. Removes duplicate provisions concerning record of proceedings. Adds provisions concerning confidentiality of a complaint against a licensee. Replaces "Director" with "Secretary" in order to update references to the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENV HEALTH LICENSE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2018-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000
2018-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2253710Amended CodeCitation Text
22537100Amended CodeCitation Text
22537105Amended CodeCitation Text
2253711New CodeSee Bill Text
22537115Amended CodeCitation Text
22537123New CodeSee Bill Text
22537125Amended CodeCitation Text
22537130Amended CodeCitation Text
2253718Amended CodeCitation Text
2253719Amended CodeCitation Text
2253731Amended CodeCitation Text
2253735Amended CodeCitation Text
2253745Repealed CodeCitation Text
2253760Amended CodeCitation Text
2253765Amended CodeCitation Text
2253770Amended CodeCitation Text
2253775Amended CodeCitation Text
2253780Amended CodeCitation Text
2253785Amended CodeCitation Text
2253790Amended CodeCitation Text
2253795Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.29Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.39New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback