IL SB2617 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Appraisal Management Company Registration Act. Makes changes to definitions. Provides that federally regulated appraisal management companies shall register with the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and pay all fees associated with registering a federally regulated appraisal management company. Requires a registration to state the name of the registrant and the address of the principal office and provides that such registration is not transferable or assignable. Requires that each registrant file an annual report with the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation that gives relevant information regarding compliance with federal and State rules. Allows the Secretary to investigate an appraisal management company at any time. Allows the Department to set fees for appraiser panels and the national registry. Allows the Department to take disciplinary action for failure to pay appraiser panel fees or national registry fees. Allows the Department to consider an applicant's moral character when granting or denying a registration. Excludes an appraisal management company from being registered or included on the national registry list if the company is owned by a person who has had his or her appraiser license or certificate refused, denied, canceled, surrendered in lieu of revocation, or revoked. Requires that an applicant shall submit his or her fingerprints to the Department of State Police and pay all fees associated with a criminal history records background check. Allows an administrator, executor, or guardian of an appraisal management company to apply for a registration. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
APPRAISAL MANAGEMENT-FED REG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0604 |
2018-07-13 | Senate | Effective Date July 13, 2018 |
2018-07-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 459 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 163 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 459 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 459 | 177 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 459 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 459 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 459 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 459 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 459 | 67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 459 | 68 | New Code | See Bill Text |