IL SB2617 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Appraisal Management Company Registration Act. Makes changes to definitions. Provides that federally regulated appraisal management companies shall register with the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and pay all fees associated with registering a federally regulated appraisal management company. Requires a registration to state the name of the registrant and the address of the principal office and provides that such registration is not transferable or assignable. Requires that each registrant file an annual report with the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation that gives relevant information regarding compliance with federal and State rules. Allows the Secretary to investigate an appraisal management company at any time. Allows the Department to set fees for appraiser panels and the national registry. Allows the Department to take disciplinary action for failure to pay appraiser panel fees or national registry fees. Allows the Department to consider an applicant's moral character when granting or denying a registration. Excludes an appraisal management company from being registered or included on the national registry list if the company is owned by a person who has had his or her appraiser license or certificate refused, denied, canceled, surrendered in lieu of revocation, or revoked. Requires that an applicant shall submit his or her fingerprints to the Department of State Police and pay all fees associated with a criminal history records background check. Allows an administrator, executor, or guardian of an appraisal management company to apply for a registration. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

APPRAISAL MANAGEMENT-FED REG

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0604
2018-07-13SenateEffective Date July 13, 2018
2018-07-13SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-000-000
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22545910Amended CodeCitation Text
22545915Amended CodeCitation Text
225459160Amended CodeCitation Text
225459163New CodeSee Bill Text
22545917New CodeSee Bill Text
225459177New CodeSee Bill Text
22545920Amended CodeCitation Text
22545925Amended CodeCitation Text
22545937New CodeSee Bill Text
22545940Amended CodeCitation Text
22545943New CodeSee Bill Text
22545947New CodeSee Bill Text
22545955Amended CodeCitation Text
22545965Amended CodeCitation Text
22545967New CodeSee Bill Text
22545968New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2617&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2617.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2617eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2617enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0604.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2617ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2617ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2617_04252018_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2617_05302018_031000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2617ham002_05312018_044001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2617ham001_05312018_044000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback