IL SB2611 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Defines "temporary door locking device". Provides that, upon submitting an application to the regional superintendent of schools, a school district may obtain a temporary door locking device for use on a school building. Specifies application requirements. Provides that an approved temporary door locking device shall be used only (i) by a staff member of a school district trained under the provision, (ii) during an emergency situation that threatens the health and safety of students and staff members or during an active shooter drill, and (iii) when law enforcement officials and the local fire department have been notified prior to use of the device. Provides that the device shall be engaged for a finite period of time in accordance with the school district's school safety plan adopted under the School Safety Drill Act. Provides that a school district with an approved temporary door locking device shall conduct an in-service training program for staff members on the proper use of the device.
Title
SCH CD-TEMP DOOR LOCK DEVICE
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2611&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2611.htm |