IL SB2611 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0575
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0575
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Estate and Generation-Skipping Transfer Tax Act. Removes a requirement that Illinois transfer tax returns must be filed with the State Treasurer. Effective immediately.
Title
ESTATE TAX-TREASURER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0575 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date July 15, 2016 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-05 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-05 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2016-04-18 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 5, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 405 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |