IL SB2610 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that no municipality, county, or road district that received distributions under this subsection (e) totaling more than $1,000,000 in the previous State fiscal year shall receive a future distribution of motor fuel tax moneys unless that municipality, county, or road district implements a business enterprise program setting goals for the inclusion of minority, veteran, and female-owned businesses in the procurement of contracts. Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall assist municipalities, counties, and road districts in implementing those programs. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOT-ROAD FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-05-31HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-31HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-004-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-05-25HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-21HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-001-001
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2018
2018-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2027052705-615New CodeSee Bill Text
355058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback