IL SB2610 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Creates a new Section concerning discretionary funding by the Commuter Rail Board.
Title
COMM RAIL-DISCRETIONARY FUNDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2014-03-21 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-10-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |