IL SB2608 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Remains in Personnel & Pensions Committee
Pending: House Personnel & Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Authorizes a State policeman to elect to establish eligible creditable service for up to 5 years of service as a full-time law enforcement officer employed by the federal government or by a state or local government located outside of Illinois for which credit is not held in any other public employee pension fund or retirement system. Provides that to obtain that credit, the applicant must file a written application with the Board, accompanied by evidence of eligibility acceptable to the Board and payment of a specified amount to be determined by the Board. Excludes a benefit increase resulting from the amendatory Act from the definition of "new benefit increase". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-SERS-STATE POLICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRemains in Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-18HouseMotion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-007-000
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-001-000
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-002-000
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40514-110Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-152.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback