IL SB2606 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-12)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0709
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-12)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0709
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that each State agency entering into or maintaining a contract for the purchase of food under the Code shall adopt a policy that permits the donation of leftover food procured by State funds. Provides that the policy shall address any daily food operations run by the agency, including one-time events, and shall contain a list of nearby soup kitchens, food pantries, and other non-profit organizations where leftover food can be donated. Requires each State agency to circulate its policy to all agency employees, and submit its food donation policy to the Department of Central Management Services on an annual basis beginning December 31, 2018. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCURE-FOOD DONATION POLICY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0709 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 55-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |